Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Nicolas-Alphonse Kunemann, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Senegambia

Titular Bishop of Pella

Prefect of Sénégal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1856BornSchweighouse-sur-Moder, France
1876¹19.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
22 May 188024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
27 Feb 190144.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal
27 Feb 190144.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Pella
27 Feb 190144.7AppointedPrefect of Sénégal
26 May 190145.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pella
20 Mar 190851.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Nicolas-Alphonse Kunemann:
Bishop François-Nicolas-Alphonse Kunemann C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Senegambia

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 445
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013