Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abel-Anastase Germain

Deceased

Bishop of Coutances (-Avranches)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1833BornSaint-Sylvain
11 Oct 185724.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 187542.7SelectedBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France
28 Jan 187642.8ConfirmedBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France
19 Mar 187643.0Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France
12 Nov 189764.6DiedBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France

MicroData Summary for Abel-Anastase Germain:
Bishop Abel-Anastase Germain (born , died ) Bishop of Coutances (-Avranches)

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 222

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013