Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Frédéric Rousselet

Deceased

Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1795Born
15 Mar 182327.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 184348.0SelectedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
25 Jan 184448.1ConfirmedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
25 Feb 184448.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
15 Mar 184448.3InstalledBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
1 Dec 188186.0DiedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Frédéric Rousselet (VIAF: 89407194)
Bishop Charles-Frédéric Rousselet (born , died ) Bishop of Sées {Séez}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Amand-Montrond

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 329
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018