Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)

Dioecesis Atrebatensis (-Bononienus-Audomarensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Arras
6th CenturyErectedDiocese of Arras (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer) (suppressed) Diocese of Arras
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Saint-Omer (suppressed) Diocese of Arras
Diocese of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)
23 November 1853Name ChangedDiocese of Arras Diocese of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)
30 March 2008Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer) (from Cambrai)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)
19501,168,545.0%1,142841,22601251,900831ap1951
19591,142,1501,276,83389.5%1,1431041,2479151991,6931,037ap1960
19701,397,159.0%8594590402301,4071,020ap1971
19801,204,0001,421,00084.7%7881038911,3511481,2021,025ap1981
19901,195,0001,425,00083.9%603906931,72471279121,043ap1991
19991,113,0001,454,00076.5%425624872,2851782708576ap2000
20001,103,0001,441,56876.5%430614912,2462181652556ap2001
20011,102,0001,440,38276.5%432594912,2442374633556ap2002
20021,103,0001,441,56876.5%387604472,4672773610518ap2003
20031,104,0001,441,56876.6%368524202,6282865528518ap2004
20041,104,0001,441,56876.6%346574032,7392869486567ap2005
20061,102,5671,439,69776.6%319513702,9793265463102ap2007
20121,138,0001,488,95176.4%230432734,1684352248832ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Nov 2013