Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Louis Parisis

Deceased

Bishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1795BornOrléans
18 Sep 181924.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Sep 183439.1SelectedBishop of Langres, France
19 Dec 183439.4ConfirmedBishop of Langres, France
8 Feb 183539.5Ordained BishopBishop of Langres, France
22 Aug 185156.0SelectedBishop of Arras, France
5 Sep 185156.1ConfirmedBishop of Arras, France
5 Mar 186670.6DiedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Louis Parisis:
Bishop Pierre-Louis Parisis (born , died ) Bishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 129
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013