Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre-Hippolyte-Xavier Monnet, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Madagascar

Titular Bishop of Pella

Superior General of Congregation of the Holy Spirit


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1812BornMouchin, France
1837²24.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
2 Mar 184836.1AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
30 Sep 184836.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Madagascar, Madagascar
3 Oct 184836.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Pella
5 Nov 184836.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pella
1 Dec 184937.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Madagascar, Madagascar

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexandre-Hippolyte-Xavier Monnet (VIAF: 9287177)
Bishop Alexandre-Hippolyte-Xavier Monnet C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Madagascar

  • a priest for 12.9 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 445
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Dec 2016