Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Romain-Frédéric Gallard

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Reims

Titular Archbishop of Anazarbus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1785BornArtenay
23 May 181226.9Ordained PriestPriest
28 Apr 183044.8SelectedBishop of Meaux, France
5 Jul 183045.0ConfirmedBishop of Meaux, France
17 Apr 183145.8Ordained BishopBishop of Meaux, France
29 Jan 183953.6SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Reims, France
21 Feb 183953.6ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Reims, France
21 Feb 183953.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anazarbus
28 Sep 183954.3DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Romain-Frédéric Gallard:
Archbishop Romain-Frédéric Gallard (born , died ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Reims

  • a priest for 27.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 73, and Page 260
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 322

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013