Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Auguste Allou (Alloux)

Deceased

Bishop of Meaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1797BornProvins
28 May 182528.3Ordained PriestPriest of Meaux, France
1 Feb 183942.0SelectedBishop of Meaux, France
21 Feb 183942.0ConfirmedBishop of Meaux, France
28 Apr 183942.2Ordained BishopBishop of Meaux, France
30 Aug 188487.6DiedBishop of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Auguste Allou (Alloux) (VIAF: 73844566)
Bishop Auguste Allou (Alloux) (born , died ) Bishop of Meaux

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 45.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 260
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1839, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016