Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Gillis

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern District, Scotland, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Limyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1802Born
9 Jun 182725.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jul 183735.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Eastern District, Scotland, Great Britain
28 Jul 183735.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Limyra
22 Jul 183836.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limyra
24 May 185250.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Eastern District, Scotland, Great Britain
24 Feb 186461.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern District, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Gillis (VIAF: 46317499)
Bishop James Gillis (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontreal, Canada

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 240
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,838, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast