Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Paterson

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern District, Scotland

Titular Bishop of Cybistra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Mar 1766³BornPathhead
179124.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 181650.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain
14 May 181650.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cybistra
18 Aug 181650.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cybistra
20 Aug 182559.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain
13 Feb 182760.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern District, Scotland, Great Britain
30 Oct 183165.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern District, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexander Paterson:
Bishop Alexander Paterson (born Mar 1766, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern District

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 40
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 171

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015