Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aeneas Chisholm

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland

Titular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Sep 1759³BornStrathglass, Inverness
1783²23.3Ordained PriestPriest
11 May 180444.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain
11 May 180444.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina
15 Sep 180546.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina
8 Jul 181454.8SucceededVicar Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain
31 Jul 181858.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aeneas Chisholm:
Bishop Aeneas Chisholm (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Highland District

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1805, Number 26
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 177

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 27 Jan 2015