Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Tavira Almazán

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1737BornIznatoraf
11 Apr 179153.5AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
7 Aug 179153.8Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
27 Jun 179658.7AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
14 Aug 179860.8AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
8 Jan 180769.2DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Tavira Almazán
Bishop Antonio Tavira Almazán (born , died ) Bishop of Salamanca

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 109, Number 569
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 9
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 144, and Page 323
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 363

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 4 Mar 2016