Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santiago Pérez Arenillas

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1739BornBecerril de Campos
27 Jun 179656.9AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
18 Sep 179657.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
17 Oct 179758.2DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Santiago Pérez Arenillas:
Bishop Santiago Pérez Arenillas (born , died ) Bishop of Gerona

  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 114, Number 598

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013