Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Aberdeen

Dioecesis Aberdonensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Hugh (Edward) Gilbert, O.S.B., Bishop
  • Peter Antony Moran, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Highland District
23 July 1727ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Scotland Vicariate Apostolic of Highland District (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District
13 February 1827Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Highland District Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District
Diocese of Aberdeen
4 March 1878ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Northern District Diocese of Aberdeen

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Aberdeen
195013,500620,0002.2%482472187438240ap1951
195913,000640,9102.0%4333761712709643ap1960
197011,405609,2731.9%363975152619241ap1971
198015,000660,0002.3%463480187586639ap1981
198815,000607,0002.5%2930592542485339ap1991
199917,650700,0002.5%2521463837403039ap2000
200016,252700,0002.3%2719463537332839ap2001
200116,000700,0002.3%27174436310382741ap2002
200215,760700,0002.3%28174535011332739ap2003
200314,469700,0002.1%29174631413332741ap2004
200411,173700,0001.6%31174823213332741ap2005
200514,732700,0002.1%31174830613332741ap2006
200620,000700,0002.9%31134445412262641ap2007
201118,378723,0002.5%31124342711231943ap2012
201218,500728,0002.5%30184838511321743ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013