Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Henry Bennett

Deceased

Bishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1875Born
9 Apr 189822.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
18 Jun 191842.9AppointedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
1 Aug 191843.1Ordained BishopBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
25 Dec 194671.5DiedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for George Henry Bennett
Bishop George Henry Bennett (born , died ) Bishop of Aberdeen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. John’s, Antigua, Diocese of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Mary of the Assumption, Cathedral, Aberdeen, Aberdeen City, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland
Death PlaceBishop's House, Aberdeen, Aberdeen City, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)Allenvale, Cemetery, Aberdeen, Aberdeen City, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 33
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 35
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast