Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Glasgow

Archidioecesis Glasguensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Philip Tartaglia, Archbishop
  • Mario Joseph Conti, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 4 March 1878
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Scotland
  • Region: Great Britain
  • Square Kilometers: 1,165 (449 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.rcag.org.uk/
  • Mailing Address: Curial Offices, 196 Clyde Street, Glasgow G1 4JY, Scotland, Great Britian
  • Telephone: (0141)226.5898
  • Fax: 225.2600

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Western District
13 February 1827ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Lowland District Vicariate Apostolic of Western District (erected)
4 March 1878Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Western District Diocese of Galloway (erected)
Archdiocese of Glasgow
4 March 1878ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Western District Archdiocese of Glasgow
25 May 1947ElevatedArchdiocese of Glasgow (became a Metroplitan)
25 May 1947Territory LostArchdiocese of Glasgow Diocese of Paisley (erected)
25 May 1947Territory LostArchdiocese of Glasgow
Diocese of Galloway
Diocese of Motherwell (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Glasgow
1950313,0751,250,00025.0%249513001,0435845065ap1951
1970323,2601,105,00029.3%33855393822112372103ap1971
1980293,0001,039,00028.2%2636232590192432111ap1981
1990281,100986,51728.5%2435029395971341109ap1991
1999233,7551,012,52623.1%2143625093583248107ap2000
2000223,534900,00024.8%2054024591293219106ap2001
2001217,002900,00024.1%19845243893100201106ap2002
2002214,615900,00023.8%1974524288669201106ap2003
2003224,344779,49028.8%1864222898368184106ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Mar 2014