Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Lynch, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1807Born
18 Jun 183326.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
31 Aug 186659.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain
31 Aug 186659.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
4 Nov 186659.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
13 Apr 186962.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
5 Mar 188881.1SucceededBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
19 Dec 189689.9DiedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for James Lynch
Bishop James Lynch C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Ordained BishopIrish, Seminary, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 116, and Page 329
  • c1: CB, 17 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,866, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast