Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Slattery

Deceased

Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1784¹BornTipperary
180925.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
10 Dec 183349.9AppointedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
24 Feb 183450.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
4 Feb 185773.0DiedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Slattery (VIAF: 315100458)
Archbishop Michael Slattery (born 1784, died ) Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly)

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 138
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Nov 2016