Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Lanigan

Deceased

Bishop of Goulburn, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1820Born
8 Apr 184827.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
18 Dec 186646.5AppointedBishop of Goulburn, Australia
9 Jun 186747.0Ordained BishopBishop of Goulburn, Australia
13 Jun 190080.0DiedBishop of Goulburn, Australia

MicroData Summary for William Lanigan (VIAF: 94143250)
Bishop William Lanigan (born , died ) Bishop of Goulburn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisdaleen, Archdiocese of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland, Ireland
Ordained BishopSs. Pierre et Paul, Cathedral, Goulburn, Diocese of Goulburn

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 296
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017