Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Mary Dunne

Deceased

Bishop of Bathurst


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1845BornKildorrery (Cloyne), Ireland
24 Jun 187025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bathurst, Australia
4 Jun 190156.0AppointedBishop of Bathurst, Australia
8 Sep 190156.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bathurst, Australia
22 Aug 191974.2DiedBishop of Bathurst, Australia

MicroData Summary for John Mary Dunne:
Bishop John Mary Dunne (born , died ) Bishop of Bathurst

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 54
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013