Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jeremiah Joseph Doyle

Deceased

Bishop of Lismore, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1849Born
24 Jun 187424.5Ordained PriestPriest of Armidale, Australia
13 May 188737.4AppointedBishop of Grafton, Australia
28 Aug 188737.7Ordained BishopBishop of Grafton, Australia
13 Jun 190050.5AppointedBishop of Lismore, Australia
4 Jun 190959.4DiedBishop of Lismore, Australia

MicroData Summary for Jeremiah Joseph Doyle
Bishop Jeremiah Joseph Doyle (born , died ) Bishop of Lismore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilmurry, Diocese of Cork, Ireland
Ordained BishopSte Marie, Cathedral, Sydney, Archdiocese of Sydney

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,585
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 289, and Page 346
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 May 2017