Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patrick Francis Cardinal Moran

Deceased

Archbishop of Sydney

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1830BornLeighlinbridge, Ireland
19 Mar 185322.3Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
22 Dec 187141.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ossory, Ireland
22 Dec 187141.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Olba
5 Mar 187241.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olba
11 Aug 187241.7SucceededBishop of Ossory, Ireland
14 Mar 188453.2AppointedArchbishop of Sydney, Australia
27 Jul 188554.6Elevated to Cardinal
30 Jul 188554.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
16 Aug 191180.7DiedArchbishop of Sydney, Australia

MicroData Summary for Patrick Francis Moran:
Cardinal Patrick Francis Moran (born , died ) Archbishop of Sydney

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
  • a cardinal for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 423, and Page 430
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 530, and Page 53
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Jul 1885

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013