Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Walshe

Deceased

Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1803Born
30 May 183026.9Ordained PriestPriest
29 Feb 185652.6AppointedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
30 Mar 185652.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
5 Mar 188884.6DiedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for James Walshe (VIAF: 315621835)
Bishop James Walshe (born , died ) Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew Ross
Ordained BishopCarlow

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 329
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017