Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Dunne

Deceased

Bishop of Wilcannia, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1846Born
31 Oct 187024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Sydney, Australia
May 187125.2IncardinatedPriest of Goulburn, Australia
13 May 188741.3AppointedBishop of Wilcannia, Australia
14 Aug 188741.5Ordained BishopBishop of Wilcannia, Australia
5 Dec 191670.8DiedBishop of Wilcannia, Australia

MicroData Summary for John Dunne
Bishop John Dunne (born , died ) Bishop of Wilcannia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePortarlington, Diocese of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
Ordained BishopSts Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Goulburn, Diocese of Goulburn

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 598
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018