Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Murray

Deceased

Bishop of Maitland, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1828Born
28 Mar 185224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
14 Nov 186537.6AppointedBishop of Maitland, Australia
14 Nov 186537.6Ordained BishopBishop of Maitland, Australia
9 Jul 190981.2DiedBishop of Maitland, Australia

MicroData Summary for James Murray
Bishop James Murray (born , died ) Bishop of Maitland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWicklow, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland
Ordained BishopSte Marie, Pro-Cathderal, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 43.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 360
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017