Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tobias Kirby

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Ephesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1803Born
26 Mar 183330.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 May 188178.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lete
5 Jun 188178.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lete
15 Jan 188683.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
20 Jan 189592.0DiedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus

MicroData Summary for Tobias Kirby (VIAF: 316746014)
Archbishop Tobias Kirby (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Ephesus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTallow, Co., Diocese of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
Ordained BishopSte Agathe des Irlandais, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 260, and Page 340
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017