Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Joseph Walsh

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1841Born
22 May 186625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
3 Jul 188544.4AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
2 Aug 188544.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
9 Apr 1921³80.1DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Joseph Walsh (VIAF: 27988544)
Archbishop William Joseph Walsh (born , died ) Archbishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Ordained BishopSte Agate des Irlandais, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 252
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,313
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017