Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick Vincent Flood, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1844Born
1867¹22.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
5 Jul 188742.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
5 Jul 188742.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Hephaestus
14 Aug 188742.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hephaestus
8 Mar 188944.4SucceededArchbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
17 May 190762.6DiedArchbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Vincent Flood
Archbishop Patrick Vincent Flood O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Port of Spain

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLagan, Diocese of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
Ordained BishopPro-Cathderal, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 302, and Page 466
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 May 2017