Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas (Alphonsus) O’Callaghan, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cork


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1839BornCork City
Jul 1863³24.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
13 Jun 188445.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cork, Ireland
13 Jun 188445.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
29 Jun 188445.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
14 Nov 188647.5SucceededBishop of Cork, Ireland
3 Dec 188647.6InstalledBishop of Cork, Ireland
14 Jun 191677.1DiedBishop of Cork, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas (Alphonsus) O’Callaghan:
Bishop Thomas (Alphonsus) O’Callaghan O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Cork

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 225, and Page 331

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013