Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Fennelly

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cashel (-Emly)

Titular Archbishop of Methymna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1845BornMoyne
7 Jun 187025.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
22 Apr 190156.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
22 Apr 190156.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ostracine
9 Jun 190156.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ostracine
22 Jul 190257.5SucceededArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
7 May 191368.3ResignedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
7 May 191368.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Methymna
24 Dec 192782.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland

MicroData Summary for Thomas Fennelly:
Archbishop Thomas Fennelly (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cashel (-Emly)

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 188, and Page 430
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013