Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Mary Harty

Deceased

Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1867Born
20 May 189426.7Ordained PriestPriest of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
4 Dec 191346.3AppointedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
18 Jan 191446.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
11 Sep 194679.0DiedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Mary Harty
Archbishop John Mary Harty (born , died ) Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMurroe

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1914, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 27 May 2020

Quantcast