Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Tuohill Murphy, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop of Port-Louis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1854BornMecbanivan, Ireland
1877²22.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
8 Jul 191662.0AppointedBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius
13 Aug 191662.1Ordained BishopBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius
16 Apr 192671.8DiedBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Tuohill Murphy:
Bishop John Baptist Tuohill Murphy C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop of Port-Louis

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013