Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Mangan

Deceased

Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1853BornBedford
1 Jul 187724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
8 Jul 190451.4AppointedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
18 Sep 190451.6Ordained BishopBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
1 Jul 191764.4DiedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Mangan:
Bishop John Mangan (born , died ) Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1918
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013