Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Browne

Deceased

Bishop of Cloyne, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1844Born
18 May 186924.5Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 189449.6AppointedBishop of Cloyne, Ireland
19 Aug 189449.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cloyne, Ireland
23 Mar 193590.3DiedBishop of Cloyne, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Robert Browne
Bishop Robert Browne (born , died ) Bishop of Cloyne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCharleville, Diocese of Cork
Ordained BishopQueenstown

  • a priest for 65.8 years
  • a bishop for 40.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,933
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 212
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,894, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast