Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Fitzgerald

Deceased

Bishop of Ross


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1832BornImogeela
19 Sep 185724.8Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 187744.7AppointedBishop of Ross, Ireland
11 Nov 187744.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ross, Ireland
24 Nov 189663.9DiedBishop of Ross, Ireland

MicroData Summary for William Fitzgerald:
Bishop William Fitzgerald (born , died ) Bishop of Ross

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 486

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013