Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Egan

Deceased

Bishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1839Born
1862²22.9Ordained PriestPriest
19 Nov 188950.8AppointedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
19 Jan 189051.0Ordained BishopBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
10 Jun 189152.3DiedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Egan
Bishop John Egan (born , died ) Bishop of Waterford and Lismore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDunnkerin
Ordained BishopSte Trinite, Cathedral, Waterford, Diocese of Waterford and Lismore

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 596
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 May 2017