Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas J. McRedmond

Deceased

Bishop of Killaloe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1838Born
1860¹21.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 188951.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Killaloe, Ireland
14 Dec 188951.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
12 Jan 189051.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
19 Jun 189152.9SucceededBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
5 Apr 190465.7DiedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas J. McRedmond
Bishop Thomas J. McRedmond (born , died ) Bishop of Killaloe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBirr, Diocese of Killaloe
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ennis

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 332, and Page 587
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017