Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Thomas O’Dwyer

Deceased

Bishop of Limerick, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1842Born
Jun 1867²25.3Ordained PriestPriest of Limerick, Ireland
18 May 188644.3AppointedBishop of Limerick, Ireland
29 Jun 188644.4Ordained BishopBishop of Limerick, Ireland
19 Aug 191775.5DiedBishop of Limerick, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edward Thomas O’Dwyer (VIAF: 315945286)
Bishop Edward Thomas O’Dwyer (born , died ) Bishop of Limerick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHoly Cross, Archdiocese of Cashel (-Emly)
Ordained BishopSt. Jean, Cathedral, Limerick, Diocese of Limerick

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1918
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 343
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 May 2017