Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Fogarty

Deceased

Bishop of Killaloe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1859BornKilcolman
13 Sep 188525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Killaloe, Ireland
8 Jul 190444.7AppointedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
4 Sep 190444.9Ordained BishopBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
12 Jul 195494.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Killaloe, Ireland
25 Oct 195596.0DiedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Michael Fogarty:
Archbishop Michael Fogarty (born , died ) Bishop of Killaloe

  • a priest for 70.1 years
  • a bishop for 51.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 218
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013