Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis Hallinan

Deceased

Bishop of Limerick, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1849Born
1874²24.1Ordained PriestPriest of Limerick, Ireland
10 Jan 191868.1AppointedBishop of Limerick, Ireland
10 Mar 191868.3Ordained BishopBishop of Limerick, Ireland
2 Jul 192373.6DiedBishop of Limerick, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Denis Hallinan
Bishop Denis Hallinan (born , died ) Bishop of Limerick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGraigue

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018