Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Cohalan

Deceased

Bishop of Cork


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1858BornKilmichael
25 Jul 188224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cork, Ireland
25 May 191455.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cork, Ireland
25 May 191455.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vaga
7 Jun 191455.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vaga
29 Aug 191658.1AppointedBishop of Cork, Ireland
24 Aug 195294.1DiedBishop of Cork, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Daniel Cohalan:
Bishop Daniel Cohalan (born , died ) Bishop of Cork

  • a priest for 70.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015