Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Donnelly

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland

Titular Bishop of Canea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1837Born
1861²23.1Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
3 Oct 188345.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland
3 Oct 188345.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Canea
4 Nov 188345.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canea
29 Mar 192082.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Dublin, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Donnelly
Bishop Nicolas Donnelly (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Ordained BishopThree Patrons, Church, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 81
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017