Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Warren

Deceased

Bishop of Ferns, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1825¹Born
1853²28.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ferns, Ireland
14 Mar 187651.2AppointedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
7 May 187651.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland
22 Apr 188459.3DiedBishop of Ferns, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Warren
Bishop Michael Warren (born 1825, died ) Bishop of Ferns

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClonmore
Ordained BishopCathedral, Enniscorthy

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 269
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017