Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paul Cardinal Cullen

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1803Born
19 Apr 182925.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 185046.6AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
24 Feb 185046.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
3 May 185249.0AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
22 Jun 186663.1Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 186663.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
24 Oct 187875.4DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Paul Cullen (VIAF: 73861970)
Paul Cardinal Cullen (born , died ) Archbishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceProspect, Diocese of Kildare and Leighlin
Ordained BishopSant’Agata dei Goti, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Holy Cross College, Clonliffe, Chapel, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
  • a cardinal for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 122, and Page 252
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 52
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1850, Number 6
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jun 1866

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017