Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Moran

Deceased

Bishop of Dunedin, New Zealand


from Cathedral Web Site

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1826Born
1847²20.6Ordained PriestPriest
19 Feb 185629.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}, South Africa
19 Feb 185629.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
30 Mar 185629.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dardanus
3 Dec 186943.5AppointedBishop of Dunedin, New Zealand
22 May 189568.9DiedBishop of Dunedin, New Zealand

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Moran
Bishop Patrick Moran (born , died ) Bishop of Dunedin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarlingford, Ireland
Ordained BishopCarlow, Ireland

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 240, and Page 253
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017