Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Wellington

Archidioecesis Vellingtonensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • John Atcherley Dew, Archbishop
  • Thomas Stafford Williams, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 10 May 1887
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: New Zealand
  • Square Kilometers: 35,810 (13,831 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.wn.catholic.org.nz/
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Centre, 22-30 Hill St., Wellington 6015; P.O. Box 1937, Thorndon, Wellington 6140, New Zealand
  • Telephone: (04)496-1737
  • Fax: 496-1754

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Wellington
20 June 1848ErectedVicariate Apostolic of New Zealand Diocese of Wellington (erected)
26 November 1869Territory LostDiocese of Wellington Diocese of Dunedin (erected)
5 May 1887Territory LostDiocese of Wellington Diocese of Christchurch (erected)
Archdiocese of Wellington
10 May 1887ElevatedDiocese of Wellington Archdiocese of Wellington
6 March 1980Territory LostArchdiocese of Wellington Diocese of Palmerston North (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Wellington
194978,000550,00014.2%8510619140810066955ap1951
1966125,380830,00015.1%18117936034828393187ap1967
1970143,500846,55517.0%1781833613971831,04192ap1971
1980157,511954,33616.5%15417833247436173591ap1981
199087,081567,00015.4%7885163534111633950ap1991
199982,201515,12416.0%71571286428223548ap2000
200082,201515,12416.0%70631336188623148ap2001
200184,201515,12416.3%71701415979822348ap2002
200284,204515,12416.3%65581236848221748ap2003
200381,189559,35014.5%63591226658320148ap2004
200481,189522,50415.5%64601246548420347ap2005
201083,214550,00015.1%60591196998218047ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.6, 8 Jan 2013; data: 4 Feb 2013