Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas O’Shea, S.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Wellington


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1870BornSan Francisco, CA, USA
3 Dec 189323.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
9 May 191343.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Wellington, New Zealand
9 May 191343.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gortyna
17 Aug 191343.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Gortyna
3 Jan 193564.8SucceededArchbishop of Wellington, New Zealand
9 May 195484.2DiedArchbishop of Wellington, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Thomas O’Shea:
Archbishop Thomas O’Shea S.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Wellington

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 44
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 187

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013