Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Penswick

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Europus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1772Born
24 Sep 179624.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Northern District, England, Great Britain
1 Apr 179725.0Ordained PriestPriest of Northern District, England, Great Britain
13 Jan 182451.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
13 Jan 182451.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Europus
29 Jun 182452.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Europus
30 Jul 183159.3SucceededVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
28 Jan 183663.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Penswick (VIAF: 36792299)
Bishop Thomas Penswick (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAshton-in-Makerfield, Wigan, Lancashire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained PriestCrook Hall, City of Durham, County Durham, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained BishopUshaw, College, Durham, County Durham, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Death PlaceAshton-in-Makerfield, Wigan, Lancashire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Buried Place (Original)Windleshaw, Abbey, Dentons Green, St Helens, Lancashire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 190
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 166
  • od/c0: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 42
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018
  • loc: CL, 22 Jan 2018
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 410, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 476, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 563, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 622, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 849, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,017, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,121, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast