Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle

Dioecesis Hagulstadensis et Novacastrensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Sťamus Cunningham, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 23 May 1861
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Liverpool
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: England
  • Region: Great Britain
  • Square Kilometers: 8,438 (3,259 Square Miles)
  • Description: The counties of Northumberland, Tyne & Wear, Durham and the part of Cleveland north of the River Tees.
  • Official Web Site: http://www.rcdhn.org.uk/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, East Denton Hall, 800 West Road, Newcastle upon Tyne NE5 2BJ, England, Great Britian
  • Telephone: (0191)228-0003
  • Fax: 274-0432

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District
30 January 1688ErectedVicariate Apostolic of England Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District (erected)
1840Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Northern District Vicariate Apostolic of Lancashire District (erected)
1840Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Northern District Vicariate Apostolic of Yorkshire District (erected)
Diocese of Hexham
29 September 1850ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Northern District Diocese of Hexham
Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle
23 May 1861Name ChangedDiocese of Hexham Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle
22 November 1924Territory LostDiocese of Hexham and Newcastle
Archdiocese of Liverpool
Diocese of Lancaster (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle
1949247,2342,242,70011.0%3292034970866559148ap1951
1969282,6592,256,80012.5%3593939871076551177ap1971
1980270,0002,379,00011.3%29337330818199511180ap1981
1990248,8622,394,00010.4%26537302824386284180ap1991
1999240,4572,250,00010.7%21932251957358227188ap2000
2000243,1832,200,00011.1%21632248980247216178ap2001
2001228,1842,200,00010.4%21930249916141213180ap2002
2002211,2002,200,0009.6%21527242872136206185ap2003
2003223,0602,515,4428.9%206172231,000225205182ap2004
2004219,3142,241,4919.8%20624230953236196183ap2005
2006217,0842,233,7209.7%194132071,048926179182ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 7 May 2014