Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Gregory Sharrock, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western District, England

Titular Bishop of Telmissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1742BornWalton le Dale, near Preston, Lancashire
1758²15.7ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1766²23.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
30 Sep 177937.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
30 Sep 177937.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Telmissus
12 Aug 178038.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Telmissus
25 Nov 179755.6SucceededVicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
17 Oct 180967.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Gregory Sharrock
Bishop William Gregory Sharrock O.S.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western District

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 180
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 396, and Page 454
  • prof: CB, 13 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016